Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean de Bruc

Deceased

Bishop of Dol, France


Events

DateEventTitle
25 Apr 1422AppointedBishop of Tréguier, France
25 Sep 1430AppointedBishop of Dol, France
22 May 1437DiedBishop of Dol, France

MicroData Summary for Jean de Bruc
Bishop Jean de Bruc (died ) Bishop of Dol

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 226, and Page 494

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 21 May 2019

Quantcast