Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ambrogio Bruci

Deceased

Bishop of ShkodrŽ (Scutari), Albania


Events

DateEventTitle
24 Aug 1824AppointedBishop of ShkodrŽ (Scutari), Albania
15 May 1825Ordained BishopBishop of ShkodrŽ (Scutari), Albania
21 Jun 1831DiedBishop of ShkodrŽ (Scutari), Albania

MicroData Summary for Ambrogio Bruci
Bishop Ambrogio Bruci (died ) Bishop of ShkodrŽ (Scutari)

  • a bishop for 6.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 337
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1825, Number 18

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018