Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio de Brizuela y Salamanca

Deceased

Bishop of Jaén


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1638¹BornReinosa
13 Sep 168850.6AppointedBishop of Astorga, Spain
13 Apr 169355.2AppointedBishop of Jaén, Spain
10 Jan 170870.0DiedBishop of Jaén, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antonio de Brizuela y Salamanca:
Bishop Antonio de Brizuela y Salamanca (born 1638, died ) Bishop of Jaén

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 102, and Page 210
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 230, Number 1,432
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1688, Number 39

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015