Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Domingo Briz Trujillo

Deceased

Bishop of Jaca


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1588¹BornVillar de los Navarros
1 Jul 164759.5AppointedBishop of Jaca, Spain
20 Oct 164759.8Ordained BishopBishop of Jaca, Spain
3 May 164860.3DiedBishop of Jaca, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Juan Domingo Briz Trujillo:
Bishop Juan Domingo Briz Trujillo (died ) Bishop of Jaca

  • a bishop for .5 years

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132, Number 11,862
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 205
  • b: Episcopologio Espaņol, Volume 1500, Page 177, Number 1,100

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015