Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Guillaume Brišonnet

Deceased

Bishop of Meaux, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1472¹Born
24 Apr 148917.3AppointedBishop of LodŔve, France
31 Dec 151543.9AppointedBishop of Meaux, France
24 Jan 153462.0DiedBishop of Meaux, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Guillaume Brišonnet (VIAF: 2467408)
Bishop Guillaume Brišonnet (born 1472, died ) Bishop of Meaux

EventPlace
Birth PlaceParis, Diocese of Paris

Source(s):
  • b: Catholic Encyclopedia
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 240, and Page 227
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 179
  • b: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1,489, Number 15*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast