Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Hermann von Breitenladenburg

Deceased

Bishop of Konstanz {Constance}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1412Born
144230.0Ordained PriestPriest
24 Apr 146654.3SelectedBishop of Konstanz {Constance}, Germany
2 Jun 146654.4ConfirmedBishop of Konstanz {Constance}, Germany
9 Nov 146654.9Ordained BishopBishop of Konstanz {Constance}, Germany
20 Sep 147462.7DiedBishop of Konstanz {Constance}, Germany

MicroData Summary for Hermann von Breitenladenburg:
Bishop Hermann von Breitenladenburg (died ) Bishop of Konstanz {Constance}

  • a priest for 32.7 years
  • a bishop for 7.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 2, Page 134
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 118, Number 10,486

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013