Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Abbot Heinrich Suso Brechter, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Abbot Emeritus of Order of Saint Benedict

Titular See: (S. Ottilia)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Aug 1910Born
May 1930³19.7EnteredMember of Order of Saint Benedict
16 May 193120.7First VowsMember of Order of Saint Benedict
1936²25.3Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
12 Jul 195746.9SelectedAbbot of Order of Saint Benedict
16 Jul 195746.9ConfirmedAbbot of Order of Saint Benedict
6 Dec 197464.3ResignedAbbot of Order of Saint Benedict
12 Feb 197564.4DiedAbbot Emeritus of Order of Saint Benedict

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Heinrich Suso Brechter (VIAF: 107570181)
Abbot Heinrich Suso Brechter O.S.B. (born , died ) Abbot Emeritus of Order of Saint Benedict

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDorndorf, Germany
Death PlaceSt. Ottilien
Buried Place (Original)Monastery, St. Ottilien

  • a priest for 39.1 years

Source(s):

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 8 Sep 2021

Quantcast