Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Andrés Bravo de Salamanca

Deceased

Bishop of Sigüenza, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1584¹Born
18 Sep 165672.7AppointedBishop of Cartagena (en España)
21 Jan 165773.0Ordained BishopBishop of Cartagena (en España)
13 Mar 166278.1AppointedBishop of Sigüenza, Spain
28 Aug 166884.6DiedBishop of Sigüenza, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Andrés Bravo de Salamanca
Bishop Andrés Bravo de Salamanca (born 1584, died ) Bishop of Sigüenza

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMartín Muñoz de las Posadas

  • a bishop for 11.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 137, and Page 311
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 187, Number 1,174
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1657, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018