Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Wulstan Bransford

Deceased

Bishop of Worcester, England, Great Britain


Events

DateEventTitle
16 Jan 1339AppointedBishop of Worcester, England, Great Britain
21 Mar 1339Ordained BishopBishop of Worcester, England, Great Britain
6 Aug 1349DiedBishop of Worcester, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Wulstan Bransford
Bishop Wulstan Bransford (died ) Bishop of Worcester

EventPlace
Ordained BishopCanterbury, Archdiocese of Canterbury, England

  • a bishop for 10.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 529
  • ob/c2: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 75
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 3, Page 57
  • ob/c23: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 83, Number 6,782

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast