Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Sigismund von Brandenburg

Deceased

Former Archbishop-Elect of Magdeburg, Germany

Titular See: (left the Church)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Dec 1538Born
155213.0SelectedArchbishop of Magdeburg, Germany
155213.0SelectedBishop of Halberstadt, Germany
18 Sep 155314.7ConfirmedArchbishop of Magdeburg, Germany
155617.0ConfirmedBishop of Halberstadt, Germany
8 May 156627.4ResignedArchbishop of Magdeburg, Germany
8 May 156627.4ResignedBishop of Halberstadt, Germany
13 Sep 156627.7DiedFormer Archbishop-Elect of Magdeburg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Sigismund von Brandenburg (VIAF: 190753205)
Father Sigismund von Brandenburg (born , died ) Former Archbishop-Elect of Magdeburg

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBerlin

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 232

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast