Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Friedrich von Brandenburg

Deceased

Archbishop-Elect of Magdeburg, Germany

Bishop of Halberstadt


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Dec 1530Born
155120.0SelectedArchbishop of Magdeburg, Germany
24 Aug 155221.6ConfirmedArchbishop of Magdeburg, Germany
12 Sep 155221.7ConfirmedBishop of Halberstadt, Germany
2 Oct 155221.8DiedArchbishop-Elect of Magdeburg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Friedrich von Brandenburg (VIAF: 13417942)
Father Friedrich von Brandenburg (born , died ) Archbishop-Elect of Magdeburg

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBerlin
Death PlaceHalberstadt, Diocese of Halberstadt

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1552
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 232, and Page 207

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast