Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Rinaldo Cardinal Brancaccio

Deceased

Cardinal-Deacon of Santi Vito, Modesto e Crescenzia

Cardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Trastevere

Administrator of Aversa


Events

DateEventTitle
17 Dec 1384Elevated to Cardinal
20 Mar 1385AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santi Vito, Modesto e Crescenzia
1408²AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Trastevere
4 Aug 1410AppointedAdministrator of Palermo, Italy
3 Jul 1412AppointedAdministrator of Taranto, Italy
1414²ResignedAdministrator of Palermo, Italy
1418²AppointedAdministrator of Aversa, Italy
1420²ResignedAdministrator of Taranto, Italy
27 Mar 1427DiedCardinal-Deacon of Santi Vito, Modesto e Crescenzia

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Rinaldo Brancaccio (VIAF: 264057993)
Rinaldo Cardinal Brancaccio (died ) Cardinal-Deacon of Santi Vito, Modesto e Crescenzia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}, Italy

  • a cardinal for 42.2 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 17 Dec 1384
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 388

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast