Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop James Brady

Deceased

Bishop of Ardagh (and Clonmacnois)

Administrator of Clonmacnoise


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1709¹Born
28 Jul 175849.5SelectedBishop of Ardagh (and Clonmacnois), Ireland
21 Aug 175849.6ConfirmedBishop of Ardagh (and Clonmacnois), Ireland
21 Aug 175849.6AppointedAdministrator of Clonmacnoise, Ireland
11 Jan 178879.0DiedBishop of Ardagh (and Clonmacnois), Ireland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for James Brady:
Bishop James Brady (born 1709, died ) Bishop of Ardagh (and Clonmacnois)

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 97, and Page 171
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1758, Number 34

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 13 Dec 2015