Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop David de Bourgogne

Deceased

Bishop of Utrecht, Netherlands


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1426¹Born
13 Sep 145125.6AppointedBishop of Thérouanne, France
13 Sep 145125.6Ordained BishopBishop of Thérouanne, France
12 Sep 145731.6AppointedBishop of Utrecht, Netherlands
16 Apr 149468.2DiedBishop of Utrecht, Netherlands

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for David de Bourgogne (VIAF: 28010563)
Bishop David de Bourgogne (born 1426, died ) Bishop of Utrecht

  • a bishop for 42.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 196, and Page 253
  • b/c3: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1451, Number 11
  • ob/c3: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 78, Number 6,262

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast