Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Charles Cardinal de Bourbon

Deceased

Archbishop of Lyon, France

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Silvestro e Martino ai Monti

Administrator of Clermont


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1435²Born
7 Nov 144611.8AppointedArchbishop of Lyon, France
1466²31.0InstalledArchbishop of Lyon, France
21 Sep 146631.7Ordained BishopArchbishop of Lyon, France
10 Mar 147641.1AppointedAdministrator of Clermont, France
18 Dec 147641.9Elevated to Cardinal
15 Jan 147742.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Silvestro e Martino ai Monti
17 Sep 148853.7DiedArchbishop of Lyon, France

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Charles de Bourbon (VIAF: 6307150749018016420007)
Charles Cardinal de Bourbon (born 1435, died ) Archbishop of Lyon

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMoulins
Ordained BishopS. Jean, Lyon, Archdiocese of Lyon
Death PlaceLyon, Archdiocese of Lyon

  • a bishop for 21.9 years
  • a cardinal for 11.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 18 Dec 1476
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 130, and Page 182
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,466, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast