Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop William de Bottlesham

Deceased

Bishop of Rochester, England, Great Britain


Events

DateEventTitle
1383¹AppointedTitular Bishop of Bethleem
2 Dec 1385AppointedBishop of Llandaff, Wales, Great Britain
27 Aug 1389AppointedBishop of Rochester, England, Great Britain
26 Feb 1400³DiedBishop of Rochester, England, Great Britain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for William de Bottlesham
Bishop William de Bottlesham (died ) Bishop of Rochester

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 422, and Page 292
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 2, Page 565
  • ob: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 81
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 135

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast