Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Eugénio Boto da Silva

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Braga

Titular Bishop of Etalonia (Hetalonia)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jan 1672³BornCaldes
3 Jul 174169.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Braga, Portugal
3 Jul 174169.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Etalonia (Hetalonia)
6 Mar 1742³70.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Etalonia (Hetalonia)
19 Apr 174876.2DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Braga, Portugal

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Eugénio Boto da Silva:
Bishop Eugénio Boto da Silva (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Braga

  • a bishop for 6.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 234, and Page 451
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1742, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015