Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Magnus Bosson

Deceased

Archbishop of Uppsala, Sweden


Events

DateEventTitle
18 May 1285AppointedArchbishop of Uppsala, Sweden
22 May 1286Ordained BishopArchbishop of Uppsala, Sweden
1 Jun 1289DiedArchbishop of Uppsala, Sweden

MicroData Summary for Magnus Bosson
Archbishop Magnus Bosson (died ) Archbishop of Uppsala

  • a bishop for 3.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 508
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 239, Number 20,019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast