Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Abbot Tommaso d’Aquino Bossart, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Abbot of Maria Einsiedeln, Switzerland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Sep 1858Born
8 Sep 187920.9ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
20 Apr 188425.5Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
30 May 190546.7AppointedAbbot of Maria Einsiedeln, Switzerland
7 Dec 192365.2DiedAbbot of Maria Einsiedeln, Switzerland

MicroData Summary for Tommaso d’Aquino Bossart
Abbot Tommaso d’Aquino Bossart O.S.B. (born , died ) Abbot of Maria Einsiedeln

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAltishofen

  • a priest for 39.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,921

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.6, 19 Dec 2019; Data: 11 Jan 2020

Quantcast