Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giberto Cardinal Borromeo

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Giovanni e Paolo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Sep 1615Born
19 Feb 165236.3Elevated to CardinalIn Pectore
2 Mar 165438.4Elevated to Cardinal
23 Mar 165438.4InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santi Giovanni e Paolo
6 Jan 167256.2DiedCardinal-Priest of Santi Giovanni e Paolo

MicroData Summary for Giberto Borromeo (VIAF: 81206482)
Giberto Cardinal Borromeo (born , died ) Cardinal-Priest of Santi Giovanni e Paolo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMilano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}, Italy

  • a cardinal for 19.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 19 Feb 1652

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast