Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Abbot Petrus (Johannes) Borne, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Abbot of Order of Saint Benedict

Titular See: (Abbot President of Beuron Benedictine Congregation)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Feb 1910Born
1929²18.8EnteredMember of Order of Saint Benedict
14 May 193020.2ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
1936²25.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
26 Feb 196555.0AppointedAbbot of Order of Saint Benedict
3 Mar 197666.0DiedAbbot of Order of Saint Benedict

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Petrus (Johannes) Borne (VIAF: 44846451)
Abbot Petrus (Johannes) Borne O.S.B. (born , died ) Abbot of Order of Saint Benedict

EventPlace
Birth PlacePrümzurlay, Germany
Death PlaceHomburg

  • a priest for 40.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: CB, 5 Oct 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018