Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pietro Maria Cardinal Borghese

Deceased

Cardinal-Deacon of San Crisogono


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1599Born
7 Oct 162425.7Elevated to Cardinal
13 Nov 162425.8InstalledCardinal-Deacon of San Giorgio in Velabro
24 Aug 162627.6AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Cosmedin
19 Dec 163334.9AppointedCardinal-Deacon of San Crisogono
15 Jun 164243.4DiedCardinal-Deacon of San Crisogono

MicroData Summary for Pietro Maria Borghese (VIAF: 89741510)
Pietro Maria Cardinal Borghese (born 1599, died ) Cardinal-Deacon of San Crisogono

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSiena, Italy

  • a cardinal for 17.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 7 Oct 1624

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast