Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Stefano Cardinal Borgia

Deceased

Prefect of the Congregation for Propagation of the Faith

Cardinal-Priest of San Clemente


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Dec 1731BornVelletri, Italy
175624.0Ordained PriestPriest
30 Mar 178957.3Elevated to Cardinal
3 Aug 178957.6AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Clemente
25 May 179866.4AppointedPro-Prefect of the Congregation for Propagation of the Faith
27 Sep 180068.8ResignedPro-Prefect of the Congregation for Propagation of the Faith
180169.0AppointedPrefect of the Congregation of the Index
16 Aug 180270.7AppointedPrefect of the Congregation for Propagation of the Faith
23 Nov 180472.9DiedPrefect of the Congregation for Propagation of the Faith

MicroData Summary for Stefano Borgia:
Stefano Cardinal Borgia (born , died ) Prefect of Propagation of the Faith

  • a priest for 48.8 years
  • a cardinal for 15.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 30 Mar 1789

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015