Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Mister Luis Antonio Jaime de Borbón y Farnesio

Deceased

Note(s): (resigned all posts/dignities)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Jul 1727Born
10 Nov 17358.2AppointedAdministrator of Toledo, Spain
19 Dec 17358.4Elevated to Cardinal
19 Dec 17358.4AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria della Scala
19 Sep 174114.1AppointedAdministrator of Sevilla {Seville}, Spain
18 Dec 175427.3ResignedAdministrator of Toledo, Spain
18 Dec 175427.3ResignedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria della Scala
18 Dec 175427.3ResignedAdministrator of Sevilla {Seville}, Spain
7 Aug 178558.0Died

MicroData Summary
Luis Antonio Jaime de Borbón y Farnesio
Mister Luis Antonio Jaime de Borbón y Farnesio
(born , died )

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBuen Retiro Palace, Madrid, Spain

Relatives
  • a cardinal for 18.9 years (Resigned)

External Link(s):

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 19 Dec 1735
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1735

============

Home | Countries | Religious Men Women | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2025
Code: web_b, v3.4.3, 19 May 2025; Data: 20 May 2025