Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas Bonzi

Deceased

Bishop of Béziers, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1601¹Born
10 Jan 162221.0AppointedBishop of Béziers, France
13 Apr 162625.2Ordained BishopBishop of Béziers, France
7 Aug 162827.5DiedBishop of Béziers, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Thomas Bonzi
Bishop Thomas Bonzi (born 1601, died ) Bishop of Béziers

  • a bishop for 2.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 116
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 87, Number 521
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1626, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast