Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Ludovico Bonito

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Taranto, Italy

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Trastevere


Events

DateEventTitle
1 Jun 1387AppointedArchbishop of Palermo, Italy
1395²AppointedArchbishop of Bar (Antivari), Montenegro
Dec 1395²SelectedArchbishop of Thessalonica
22 May 1396ConfirmedArchbishop of Thessalonica
5 Sep 1399AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Bergamo, Italy
18 Jul 1400SelectedArchbishop of Pisa, Italy
15 Nov 1400ConfirmedArchbishop of Pisa, Italy
1407¹AppointedArchbishop of Taranto, Italy
29 Jul 1407InstalledArchbishop of Taranto, Italy
9 May 1408Elevated to Cardinal
9 May 1408AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Trastevere
1412¹ResignedArchbishop of Taranto, Italy
18 Sep 1413DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Taranto, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ludovico Bonito
Archbishop Ludovico Bonito (died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Taranto

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAgrigento, Diocese of Agrigento (Girgenti)
Death PlaceRimini, Diocese of Rimini
Buried Place (Original)S. Francesco, Church, Rimini, Diocese of Rimini

  • a cardinal for 5.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 93, and Page 484
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 396, and Page 400
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 473, and Page 388
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 9 May 1408

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 25 Aug 2021

Quantcast