Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Filippo Cardinal Boncompagni

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of San Sisto

Archpriest of the Basilica di Santa Maria Maggiore {Saint Mary Major Basilica}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Sep 1548BornBologna, Italy
2 Jun 157223.7Elevated to Cardinal
16 Jun 157223.8InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Sisto
158132.3AppointedArchpriest of the Basilica di Santa Maria Maggiore {Saint Mary Major Basilica}
9 Jun 158637.8DiedCardinal-Priest of San Sisto

MicroData Summary for Filippo Boncompagni:
Cardinal Filippo Boncompagni (born , died ) Cardinal-Priest of San Sisto

  • a cardinal for 14.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 2 Jun 1572

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013