Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Sebastiano Pompilio Bonaventura

Deceased

Bishop of Corneto (Tarquinia) e Montefiascone, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Apr 1651³Born
27 Nov 169039.6AppointedBishop of Gubbio, Italy
15 Nov 170655.6AppointedBishop of Corneto (Tarquinia) e Montefiascone, Italy
May 1734³83.0DiedBishop of Corneto (Tarquinia) e Montefiascone, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Sebastiano Pompilio Bonaventura
Bishop Sebastiano Pompilio Bonaventura (born , died May 1734) Bishop of Corneto (Tarquinia) e Montefiascone

EventPlace
Birth PlaceUrbino

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 197, and Page 274
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1690, Number 47

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018