Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Alberto Cardinal Bolognetti

Deceased

Bishop of Massa Marittima, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Jul 1538Born
25 Feb 157637.6AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Florence (Tuscany), Italy
10 Sep 157840.1AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Venice, Italy
27 Apr 157940.8AppointedBishop of Massa Marittima, Italy
12 Apr 158142.7AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Poland
12 Dec 158345.4Elevated to Cardinal
Feb 1585³46.5ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Poland
17 May 158546.8DiedBishop of Massa Marittima, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Alberto Bolognetti (VIAF: 3284389)
Alberto Cardinal Bolognetti (born , died ) Bishop of Massa Marittima

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBologna, Diocese of Bologna
Death PlaceVillach, Carinthia
Buried Place (Original)Family Tomb, S. Maria dei Servi, Church, Bologna, Archdiocese of Bologna

  • a cardinal for 1.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 12 Dec 1583
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 237
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Biaudet), Page 255
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1579, Number 14*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018