Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giuseppe Cardinal Bofondi

Deceased

Cardinal-Deacon of San Cesareo in Palatio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Oct 1795Born
21 Dec 184651.1Elevated to CardinalIn Pectore
11 Jun 184751.6Elevated to Cardinal
14 Jun 184751.6AppointedCardinal-Deacon of San Cesareo in Palatio
2 Jan 184852.1AppointedSecretary of State
10 Mar 184852.3ResignedSecretary of State
2 Dec 186772.1DiedCardinal-Deacon of San Cesareo in Palatio

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Bofondi (VIAF: 88797040)
Giuseppe Cardinal Bofondi (born , died ) Cardinal-Deacon of San Cesareo in Palatio

EventPlace
Birth PlaceForli, Italy
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a cardinal for 20.9 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 54
  • xsta: Le Nunziature Apostoliche (Marchi), Page 10, and Page 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 10 Mar 2018