Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Stephan Bodecker, O. Praem. †

Deceased

Bishop of Brandenburg, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1384¹Born
141531.0ProfessedMember of Order of the Canons Regular of Premontre; Norbertines
1 Sep 142137.6AppointedBishop of Brandenburg, Germany
May 142238.3Ordained BishopBishop of Brandenburg, Germany
15 Feb 145975.1DiedBishop of Brandenburg, Germany

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Stephan Bodecker (VIAF: 30339016)
Bishop Stephan Bodecker O. Praem. (born 1384, died ) Bishop of Brandenburg

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRathenow

  • a bishop for 36.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 193, Number 15,600
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 145

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast