Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Charles Bobba de Montferrat

Deceased

Bishop of Saint-Jean-de-Maurienne


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1577Born
13 May 161942.4AppointedBishop of Saint-Jean-de-Maurienne, France
15 Jul 161942.5Ordained BishopBishop of Saint-Jean-de-Maurienne, France
10 Feb 163659.1DiedBishop of Saint-Jean-de-Maurienne, France

MicroData Summary for Charles Bobba de Montferrat:
Bishop Charles Bobba de Montferrat (died ) Bishop of Saint-Jean-de-Maurienne

  • a bishop for 16.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 235

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013