Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Bobadilla

Deceased

Bishop of Salamanca, Spain


Events

DateEventTitle
22 Jan 1509AppointedBishop of Ciudad Rodrigo, Spain
18 Nov 1510AppointedBishop of Salamanca, Spain
29 Aug 1529DiedBishop of Salamanca, Spain

MicroData Summary for Francisco Bobadilla
Bishop Francisco Bobadilla (died ) Bishop of Salamanca

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSegovia

Source(s):
  • b: Episcopologio Espaņol, Volume 1500, Page 26, Number 75
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 168, and Page 289

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018