Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Georg von Blumenthal

Deceased

Bishop of Lebus

Bishop of Ratzeburg


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1490²BornSchloss Horst bei Blumenthal
Feb 152434.1SelectedBishop of Lebus, Germany
6 Apr 152434.3ConfirmedBishop of Lebus, Germany
Aug 152434.6SelectedCoadjutor Bishop of Ratzeburg, Germany
2 Oct 152434.8SucceededBishop of Ratzeburg, Germany
6 Mar 152535.2ConfirmedBishop of Ratzeburg, Germany
25 Oct 155060.8DiedBishop of Lebus, Germany

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Georg von Blumenthal:
Bishop Georg von Blumenthal (died ) Bishop of Lebus

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 228

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013