Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Christoph Blöbel

Deceased

Prefect of Meißen (Meissen) {Lusazia o Lausitz; Sassonia}, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1546Born
21 Sep 156923.7Ordained PriestPriest
15 Aug 159448.6AppointedPrefect of Meißen (Meissen) {Lusazia o Lausitz; Sassonia}, Germany
4 Feb 160963.0DiedPrefect of Meißen (Meissen) {Lusazia o Lausitz; Sassonia}, Germany

MicroData Summary for Christoph Blöbel
Father Christoph Blöbel (born 1546, died ) Prefect of Meißen (Meissen) {Lusazia o Lausitz; Sassonia}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBautzen

  • a priest for 39.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018