Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Friedrich de Blankenheim

Deceased

Bishop of Utrecht, Netherlands


Events

DateEventTitle
5 Jul 1375AppointedBishop of Strasbourg, France
13 Oct 1391AppointedAdministrator of Basel, Switzerland
7 Jul 1393AppointedBishop of Utrecht, Netherlands
10 Oct 1423DiedBishop of Utrecht, Netherlands

MicroData Summary for Friedrich de Blankenheim
Bishop Friedrich de Blankenheim (died ) Bishop of Utrecht

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 105, and Page 491
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 130

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 17 Aug 2021

Quantcast