Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Walter Blake

Deceased

Bishop of Achonry, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1684¹Born
26 Jul 173955.5SelectedBishop of Achonry, Ireland
13 Aug 173955.6ConfirmedBishop of Achonry, Ireland
3 Jun 1758³74.4DiedBishop of Achonry, Ireland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Walter Blake
Bishop Walter Blake (born 1684, died ) Bishop of Achonry

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 63
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1739, Number 52
  • b: The Irish Catholic Episcopal Corps, 1657-1829, Volume 2, Page 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 17 Aug 2020

Quantcast