Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop James Blakedon, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Bangor, Wales


Events

DateEventTitle
15 Oct 1442AppointedBishop of Achonry, Ireland
7 Feb 1453AppointedBishop of Bangor, Wales, Great Britain
24 Oct 1464DiedBishop of Bangor, Wales, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for James Blakedon:
Bishop James Blakedon O.P. (died ) Bishop of Bangor

Source(s):
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 1, Page 102
  • ob: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 89

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013