Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Alban Francis Swarbrick (of Blackburn), O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Prefect Emeritus of Jullundur, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Sep 1892Born
25 Mar 191825.5Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
31 Oct 195260.1AppointedPrefect of Jullundur, India
197178.3ResignedPrefect of Jullundur, India
9 Sep 197987.0DiedPrefect Emeritus of Jullundur, India

MicroData Summary for Alban Francis Swarbrick (of Blackburn)
Father Alban Francis Swarbrick (of Blackburn) O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Prefect Emeritus of Jullundur

  • a priest for 61.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1971

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast