Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paolo Bisanti

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Kotor (Cattaro), Montenegro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1529²Born
12 Oct 156536.7AppointedBishop of Kotor (Cattaro), Montenegro
1578¹49.0ResignedBishop of Kotor (Cattaro), Montenegro
4 Mar 158758.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Kotor (Cattaro), Montenegro

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Paolo Bisanti (VIAF: 40272404)
Bishop Paolo Bisanti (born 1529, died ) Bishop Emeritus of Kotor (Cattaro)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKotor, Diocese of Kotor (Cattaro)
Death PlaceUdine, Patriarchate of Aquileia, Italy

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 160
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1565, Number 28*
  • b: AT, 6 Sep 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 7 Sep 2020

Quantcast