Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Maria Biordi

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Dulma


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Oct 1764Born
7 Oct 178723.0Ordained PriestPriest
23 Sep 181651.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Dulma
7 Oct 181753.0DiedTitular Bishop of Dulma

MicroData Summary for Francesco Maria Biordi
Bishop Francesco Maria Biordi (born , died ) Titular Bishop of Dulma

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTalamello, Italy

  • a priest for 30.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1816, Number 65
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 181

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018