Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Jean Chrysostome Bigel, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Former Bishop-Elect of Eumenia

Titular See: (refused)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Feb 1854BornSaint-Etienne, France
27 Feb 190147.0AppointedVicar Apostolic of Arabia, Yemen
27 Feb 190147.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Eumenia
1902¹47.9ResignedVicar Apostolic of Arabia, Yemen
1902¹47.9ResignedTitular Bishop of Eumenia
12 Aug 193177.5DiedFormer Bishop-Elect of Eumenia

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ⁸ Did Not Take Effect

MicroData Summary for Jean Chrysostome Bigel:
Priest Jean Chrysostome Bigel O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Former Bishop-Elect of Eumenia

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 265
  • b: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1901

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013