Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Johann Adam von Bicken

Deceased

Archbishop-Elect of Mainz, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 May 1564Born
15 May 160136.9SelectedArchbishop of Mainz, Germany
27 Aug 160137.2ConfirmedArchbishop of Mainz, Germany
10 Jan 160439.6DiedArchbishop-Elect of Mainz, Germany

MicroData Summary for Johann Adam von Bicken
Father Johann Adam von Bicken (born , died ) Archbishop-Elect of Mainz

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHainchen

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1601

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018