Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Carlo Cardinal Bichi

Deceased

Cardinal-Deacon of Sant’Agata de’ Goti


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 May 1638Born
13 Feb 169051.7Elevated to Cardinal
10 Apr 169051.9InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Cosmedin
22 Dec 169355.6AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Agata de’ Goti
7 Nov 171880.5DiedCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Agata de’ Goti

MicroData Summary for Carlo Bichi
Carlo Cardinal Bichi (born , died ) Cardinal-Deacon of Sant’Agata de’ Goti

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSiena, Italy

  • a cardinal for 28.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 13 Feb 1690

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018