Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Lorenzo Cardinal Bianchetti

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Panisperna


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Sep 1545BornBologna, Italy
5 Jun 159650.7Elevated to Cardinal
21 Jun 159650.8InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Panisperna
12 Mar 161266.5DiedCardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Panisperna

MicroData Summary for Lorenzo Bianchetti:
Cardinal Lorenzo Bianchetti (born , died ) Cardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Panisperna

  • a cardinal for 15.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 5 Jun 1596

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013