Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giovanni Crisostomo Bianchi, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Titular Archbishop of Nazareth


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
Oct 1675BornNapoli
19 Dec 169924.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of St. Augustine
8 Apr 172650.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Nazareth
15 Apr 172650.5DiedTitular Archbishop of Nazareth

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Crisostomo Bianchi:
Archbishop Giovanni Crisostomo Bianchi O.S.A. (died ) Titular Archbishop of Nazareth

  • a priest for 26.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 282

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013