Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marcin Białobrzeski, O. Cist. †

Deceased

Bishop of Kamyanets-Podilskyi (Kamieniec), Ukraine


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1530¹Born
3 Apr 156636.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Krakˇw, Poland
3 Apr 156636.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Laodicea in Phrygia
19 Jul 157747.5AppointedBishop of Kamyanets-Podilskyi (Kamieniec), Ukraine
19 Apr 158656.2DiedBishop of Kamyanets-Podilskyi (Kamieniec), Ukraine

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Marcin Białobrzeski (VIAF: 102025979)
Bishop Marcin Białobrzeski O. Cist. (born 1530, died ) Bishop of Kamyanets-Podilskyi (Kamieniec)

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 148, and Page 218
  • b: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1566, Number 11*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018