Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Ambrogio Cardinal Bianchi, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Priest of the Roman Curia - Other

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Andrea e Gregorio al Monte Celio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Oct 1771BornCremona, Italy
6 Apr 183563.5Elevated to CardinalIn Pectore
8 Jul 183967.7Elevated to Cardinal
8 Jul 183967.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Andrea e Gregorio al Monte Celio
3 Mar 185684.4DiedPriest of the Roman Curia - Other

MicroData Summary for Ambrogio Bianchi:
Cardinal Ambrogio Bianchi O.S.B. (born , died ) Priest of Roman Curia - Other

  • a cardinal for 20.9 years

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013