Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Teodoro Botelho Homen Bernardes

Deceased

Archbishop of Cranganore (Angamala), India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Nov 1739³Born
5 Dec 176223.0Ordained PriestPriest
8 Jan 180666.1SelectedArchbishop of Cranganore (Angamala), India
26 Aug 180666.7ConfirmedArchbishop of Cranganore (Angamala), India

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Teodoro Botelho Homen Bernardes
Archbishop Teodoro Botelho Homen Bernardes (born ) Archbishop of Cranganore (Angamala)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLisboa, Patriarchate of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal

Source(s):
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,806, Number 27
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 166

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast