Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Antonio de Benavides y Bazán

Deceased

Patriarch of West Indies

Titular Archbishop of Tyrus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1612¹BornMadrid, Spain
Jul 1670³58.5AppointedApostolic Internuncio to Spain
Oct 1670³58.7ResignedApostolic Internuncio to Spain
10 Apr 167967.2AppointedTitular Archbishop of Tyrus
8 May 167967.3AppointedPatriarch of West Indies, Spain
28 May 167967.4Ordained BishopPatriarch of West Indies, Spain
Sep 1689³77.6AppointedApostolic Internuncio to Spain
Aug 1690³78.5ResignedApostolic Internuncio to Spain
22 Jan 169179.0DiedPatriarch of West Indies, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antonio de Benavides y Bazán
Patriarch Antonio de Benavides y Bazán (born 1612, died ) Patriarch of West Indies

  • a bishop for 11.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 228, and Page 396
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 110, Number 9,699
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 219, Number 1,361
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1679, Number 9
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Karttunen), Page 233

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 1 Nov 2016